EP1604166 - DISCHARGE DEVICE FOR LIGHT MATERIALS, SUCH AS CONFETTI OR SIMILAR, AND/OR EMULSIONS, SUCH AS FOAM, SNOW OR SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Effects 87, route de Montcenis 71200 Le Creusot / FR | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIZZINI, Jean-Yves La croix d'Etevoux F-71510 Perreuil / FR | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Honoré, Anne-Claire Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Honoré, Anne-Claire Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | Application number, filing date | 04715926.4 | 01.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004FR00474 | Priority number, date | FR20030003273 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303273 | [2005/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081484 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604166 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604166 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F41B11/04 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
F41B11/71 (EP,US);
A47B57/48 (EP);
A63H37/00 (EP);
A63J5/025 (EP);
A63J5/028 (EP);
F41B11/57 (EP);
F41B11/81 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERFUNG LEICHTER STOFFE WIE KONFETTI ODER DERGLEICHEN UND/ODER EMULSIONEN WIE SCHAUM, SCHNEE ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2005/50] | English: | DISCHARGE DEVICE FOR LIGHT MATERIALS, SUCH AS CONFETTI OR SIMILAR, AND/OR EMULSIONS, SUCH AS FOAM, SNOW OR SIMILAR | [2005/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE MATERIAUX LEGERS TELS QUE DES CONFETTIS OU ANALOGUES ET/OU DES EMULSIONS TELLES QUE DE LA MOUSSE, DE LA NEIGE OU ANALOGUE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 29.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | CZ | 06.09.2006 | EE | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | IE | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | PL | 06.09.2006 | RO | 06.09.2006 | SI | 06.09.2006 | SK | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | BG | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | LU | 01.03.2007 | HU | 07.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CY | 06.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
LU | 01.03.2007 | ||
HU | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4046492 (INGLIS LESLIE R) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5015211 (REVEEN TYRONE J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, lines 42-55 ** figure 4 *; | [AD]WO0054864 (AUSTIN JOSEPH JAMES [US], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6364737 (STERR ARDINA K [US], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6149495 |