EP1601863 - EXHAUST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T. Baden Hardstaff Limited Hillside Gotham Road Kingston-on-Soar Nottingham NG11 0DF / GB | [2011/35] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states T Baden Hardstaff Limited Hillside, Gotham Road Kingston-on-Soar Nottingham NG11 0DF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLETCHER, Trevor Lee St. Anne's Manor Hungary Lane, Sutton Bonington Nr. Loughborough, Leicestershire LE12 5NB / GB | 02 /
STORRAR, Stephen David 171 Weston Road Aston-on-Trent Derby DE72 2BA / GB | [2011/39] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
FLETCHER, Trevor Lee St. Anne's Manor, Hungary Lane, Sutton Bonington Nr. Loughborough, Leicestershire LE12 5NB / GB | ||
02 /
STORRAR, Stephen David 171 Weston Road, Aston-on-Trent Derby DE72 2BA / GB | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04715949.6 | 01.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004GB00821 | Priority number, date | GB20030004629 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0304629 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076830 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601863 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601863 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/08, F16K1/22 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
F01N3/2892 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N13/0093 (EP);
F01N13/011 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP);
F01N3/2053 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Title | German: | ABGASSYSTEM | [2005/49] | English: | EXHAUST SYSTEM | [2005/49] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | AT | 01.03.2012 | CZ | 01.03.2012 | FI | 01.03.2012 | IE | 01.03.2012 | IT | 01.03.2012 | LU | 01.03.2012 | PL | 01.03.2012 | TR | 01.03.2012 | HU | 02.03.2012 | SI | 02.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | DK | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/25] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
AT | 01.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
PL | 01.03.2012 | ||
TR | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
AT | 01.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
PL | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
PL | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
PL | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
IT | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
SI | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
HU | 02.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
IE | 01.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2012 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 01.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 28.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01163246 ; | [A]JP2001304031 ; | [A]FR1212320 (WHEELER VALVE CORP) [A] 4* figure 6 *; | [Y]DE19539708 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,5-7,20-23,28 * column 3, line 1 - line 46; figures 1,15 *; | [X]US5632304 (KEMPKA KARL H [DE], et al) [X] 1,28,29 * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP0808999 (FUJI VALVE [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,10,12,26-32 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,5-7; | [Y]US6321530 (HOSHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5-7,20-23,28 * column 23, line 37 - column 24, line 13 *; | [A]EP1217196 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15,28,30-32 * figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890922), vol. 013, no. 427, Database accession no. (C - 639), & JP01163246 A 19890627 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [Y] 3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001304031 A 20011031 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,13,14,16,17 * abstract * |