EP1597449 - FIBER CEMENT FENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states James Hardie Technology Limited Europa House, Second Floor Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2010/27] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states James Hardie International Finance B.V. Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3077 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGH, Jeffrey 372 Freeman, Apt. 11 Long Beach, CA 90814 / US | 02 /
PARADIS, Duane, R. 14090 Baldwin Ct. Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91739 / US | 03 /
SILVERSTEIN, Brian 1622 Schaller Dyer, IN 46311 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Lenney, James Patrick, et al James Hardie Technology Limited Europa House, 2nd Floor, Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2011/12] |
Former [2005/47] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04716125.2 | 01.03.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004US06130 | Priority number, date | US20030451341P | 28.02.2003 Original published format: US 451341 P | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004079132 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597449 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/14 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
E04H17/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAUN AUS FASERZEMENT | [2005/47] | English: | FIBER CEMENT FENCE SYSTEM | [2005/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE CLOTURE EN FIBROCIMENT | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 11.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH282660 (JAISLI EDWIN [CH]); | [A]GB2054692 (MARLEY BUILDINGS LTD); | [X]US5452968 (DLUGOSZ LEONARD T [US]) [X] 20-24,46-57,68-71 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 45 *; | [X]US6231031 (MICHAEL STEPHEN W [US], et al) [X] 25-67,72-78 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]DE20113700U (MOSEBACH VIKTOR [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 1, line 1 - line 28; figures 1-8; claim 5 * [A] 20-78 | Examination | US2002088584 | by applicant | US90060 | US451341 | US970389 | US969964 | AU515151B | US6030447 | US6572697 | US6676745 | US6676744 |