20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
28.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
14.03.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
06.04.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
03.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.09.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.05.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.10.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
21.10.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|