EP1601944 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BALANCING JOURNAL-LESS ROTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schenck RoTec GmbH Landwehrstrasse 55 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THELEN, Dieter Am Sandrain 2 64397 Modautal / DE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716207.8 | 02.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004DE00389 | Priority number, date | DE2003110725 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10310725 | [2005/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081512 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601944 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601944 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/04 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
G01M1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSWUCHTEN VON ZAPFENLOSEN ROTOREN | [2005/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BALANCING JOURNAL-LESS ROTORS | [2005/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EQUILIBRER DES ROTORS SANS TOURILLON | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.05.2007 | DK | 09.05.2007 | EE | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | IE | 09.05.2007 | NL | 09.05.2007 | SI | 09.05.2007 | SK | 09.05.2007 | TR | 09.05.2007 | BG | 09.08.2007 | SE | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
DK | 09.05.2007 | ||
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
EE | 09.05.2007 | ||
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SK | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
NL | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
BG | 09.08.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SI | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SE | 09.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3570278 (LANNEN JOSEPH P) [A] 1,7,19 * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * * column 3, line 20 ** figure 2 *; | [DX]US4543825 (SCHOENFELD HARALD [DE], et al) [DX] 1-4,7-12,14,17,20 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]DE4441951 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [X] 1,5-7,18 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * * column 4 - column 5 * * figures 1,4,8 * |