EP1604522 - GENERATION OF TELEVISION RECOMMENDATIONS VIA NON-CATEGORICAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pace Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Pace MicroTechnology PLC Victoria Road Saltaire, Shipley West Yorkshire BD18 3LF / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTTA, Srinivas P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04716288.8 | 02.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004IB00683 | Priority number, date | US20030453756P | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 453756 P | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004082257 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1604522 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/466 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4666 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/4756 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON FERNSEHPROGRAMMEMPFEHLUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON NICHT-KATEGORISCHEN INFORMATIONEN | [2005/50] | English: | GENERATION OF TELEVISION RECOMMENDATIONS VIA NON-CATEGORICAL INFORMATION | [2005/50] | French: | GENERATION DE RECOMMANDATIONS DE TELEVISION AU MOYEN D'INFORMATIONS NON-CATEGORIQUES | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0160064 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-7,14-19,21,22 * page 7, line 10 - line 23 * * page 8, line 9 - line 20 * * column 14, line 21 - line 33 * * page 18, line 13 - page 19, line 2 * [Y] 8,9,13,20; | [Y]WO0211440 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 8,9,20 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 *; | [YA]US5410344 (GRAVES GORDON T [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 54 * * figures 5,6 * [A] 1-3,14,15,21,22; | [A]EP0572090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,3,4,14-16,21,22 * column 5, line 35 - line 45 * * column 6, line 1 - line 46 *; | [A]WO0225937 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 10-12 * abstract * |