EP1604203 - METHODS FOR DIRECT DETECTION OF INDIVIDUAL METHOTREXATE METABOLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prometheus Laboratories, Inc. 9410 Carroll Park Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Prometheus Laboratories, Inc. 9410 Caroll Park Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Prometheus Laboratories, Inc. 5739 Pacific Center Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121-4203 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERVIEUX, Thierry 4905 Enfield Avenue Encino, CA 91316 / US | 02 /
RICHERSON, Russell 5050 East Gleneagles Drive Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
DERVIEUX, Thierry 4905 Enfield Avenue Encino, CA 92121 / US | ||
02 /
RICHERSON, Russell 5050 East Gleneagles Drive Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | |||
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
DERVIEUX, Thierry 3922 Florida Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | ||
02 /
RICHERSON, Russell 5050 East Gleneagles Drive Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716493.4 | 02.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US06312 | Priority number, date | US20030384066 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: US 384066 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004081521 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1604203 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604203 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/00, G01N30/02, G01N21/75, G01N21/62, A01N1/02, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/94 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DIREKTEN NACHWEIS EINZELNER METHOTREXATMETABOLITE | [2005/50] | English: | METHODS FOR DIRECT DETECTION OF INDIVIDUAL METHOTREXATE METABOLITES | [2005/50] | French: | METHODES DE DETECTION DIRECTE DE METABOLITES DE METHOTREXATE INDIVIDUELS | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09013484.2 / EP2148199 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.2009 | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | IE | 02.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | PL | 28.10.2009 | |
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | PT | 01.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2004020622 (PROMETHEUS LAB INC [US], et al) [E] 1-44 * example 1 *; | [X] - BROUWER CONNIE ET AL, "Analysis of methotrexate (MTX) and MTX-polyglutamates using affinity/HPLC with post-column derivatization", FASEB JOURNAL, & ANNUAL MEETING OF PROFESSIONAL RESEARCH SCIENTISTS: EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 2000; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; APRIL 15-18, 2000, (20000315), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0892-6638, page A720, XP008078811 [X] 1-44 * abstract * | International search | [X] - MASSON E. ET AL, "Accumulation of Methotrexate Polyglutamates in Lymphoblasts Is a Determinant of Antileukemic Effects In Vivo . A Rationale for High-Dose Methotrexate", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199601), vol. 97, no. 1, pages 73 - 80, XP002982097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI118409 | [X] - GALPIN A.J. ET AL, "Differences in folylpolyglutamate synthetase and dihydrofolate reductase expression in human B-lineage versus T-lineage leukemic lymphoblasts: mechanismsfor lineage differences in methotrexate polyglutamylation and cytotoxicity.", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1997), vol. 52, pages 155 - 163, XP002982098 | [X] - KRAKOWER G.R. AND NYLEN P.A. AND KAMEN B.A., "Separation and identification of subpicomole amounts of methotrexate polyglutamates in animal and human biopsy material", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 412 - 416, XP002903650 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(82)90303-7 | [Y] - RUBINO F.M., "Separation methods for methotrexate, its structural analogues and metabolites", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, vol. 764, pages 217 - 254, XP004322155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(01)00402-9 | [Y] - SALAMOUN J. AND FRANTISEK J., "Determination of methotrexate and its metabolites 7-hydroxymethotrexate and 2,4-diamino-N10-methylpteroic acid in biological fluids by liquid chromatography with fluorimetric detection.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1986), vol. 378, no. 1, pages 173 - 181, XP002903614 | [Y] - SALAMOUN J. ET AL, "Column liquid chromatography of methotrexate and its metabolites using a post-column photochemical reactor and fluorescence detection", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1987), vol. 419, pages 2137 - 223, XP002971635 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(87)80279-7 | [A] - DERVIEUX T. ET AL, "Effect of methotrexate polyglutamates on thioguanine nucleotide concentrations during continuation therapy of acute lymphoblastic leukemia with mercaptopurine", LEUKEMIA, (2002), vol. 16, pages 209 - 212, XP002982099 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.leu.2402373 | [A] - SYNOLD T.W. ET AL, "Blast cell methotrexate-polyglutamate accumulation in vivo differs by lineage, ploidy, and methotrexate dose in acute lymphoblastic leukemia.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199411), vol. 94, pages 1996 - 2001, XP002982100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI117552 | [A] - DERVIEUX T. ET AL, "HPLC Determination of Erythrocyte Methotrexate Polyglutamates after Low-Dose Methotrexate Therapy in Patients with Rheumatoid Arthritis", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 10, pages 1632 - 1641, XP002903601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/49.10.1632 | Examination | - FREIDOUN ALBERTIONI ET AL, "Simultaneous quantitation of methotrexate and its two main metabolites in biological fluids by a novel solid-phase extraction procedure using high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (1995), vol. 665, pages 163 - 170, XP004043641 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(94)00507-2 |