EP1646644 - POSH INTERACTING PROTEINS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proteologics, Inc. 40 Ramland Road South, Suite 10 Orangeburg, NY 10962 / US | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGLICHT, Daniel, N. 33 Ha'Alonim St. Lapid 73133 / IL | 02 /
ALROY, Iris Hashirion Street 10/17 74065 Nes Ziona / IL | 03 /
REISS, Yuval Hahavazelet 11/6 Kiriat-ono / IL | 04 /
YAAR, Liora 8 Kalisher Street 43354 Raanana / IL | 05 /
BEN-AVRAHAM, Danny Igal Alon 20 Zichron Jackov / IL | 06 /
TUVIA, Shmuel Hartzit 1 42490 Netanya / IL | 07 /
GREENER, Tsvika Bilu St. 19/25 Ness Ziona 74061 / IL | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
TAGLICHT, Daniel, N. 33 Ha'Alonim St. Lapid 73133 / IL | ||
02 /
ALROY, Iris Hashirion Street 10/17 74065 Nes Ziona / IL | |||
03 /
REISS, Yuval Hahavazelet 11/6 Kiriat-ono / IL | |||
04 /
YAAR, Liora 8 Kalisher Street 43354 Raanana / IL | |||
05 /
BEN-AVRAHAM, Danny Igal Alon 20 Zichron Jackov / IL | |||
06 /
TUVIA, Shmuel Hartzit 1 42490 Netanya / IL | |||
07 /
GREENER, Tsvika Hahavazelet 9a Ness Ziona / IL | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716503.0 | 02.03.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004US06308 | Priority number, date | US20030451437P | 03.03.2003 Original published format: US 451437 P | US20030452284P | 05.03.2003 Original published format: US 452284 P | US20030455760P | 19.03.2003 Original published format: US 455760 P | US20030456640P | 20.03.2003 Original published format: US 456640 P | US20030460526P | 03.04.2003 Original published format: US 460526 P | US20030460792P | 04.04.2003 Original published format: US 460792 P | US20030464285P | 21.04.2003 Original published format: US 464285 P | US20030469462P | 09.05.2003 Original published format: US 469462 P | US20030471378P | 15.05.2003 Original published format: US 471378 P | US20030472327P | 20.05.2003 Original published format: US 472327 P | US20030474706P | 30.05.2003 Original published format: US 474706 P | US20030475825P | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 475825 P | US20030479317P | 17.06.2003 Original published format: US 479317 P | US20030480215P | 19.06.2003 Original published format: US 480215 P | US20030480376P | 19.06.2003 Original published format: US 480376 P | US20030493860P | 08.08.2003 Original published format: US 493860 P | US20030498634P | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 498634 P | US20030503931P | 16.09.2003 Original published format: US 503931 P | WO2003US35712 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: PCT/US0335/712 | WO2004US03600 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: PCT/US2004/003600 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/16] | US20030451437P | 03.03.2003 | |
US20030452284P | 05.03.2003 | ||
US20030455760P | 19.03.2003 | ||
US20030456640P | 20.03.2003 | ||
US20030460526P | 03.04.2003 | ||
US20030460792P | 04.04.2003 | ||
US20030464285P | 21.04.2003 | ||
US20030469462P | 09.05.2003 | ||
US20030471378P | 15.05.2003 | ||
US20030472327P | 20.05.2003 | ||
US20030474706P | 30.05.2003 | ||
US20030475825P | 03.06.2003 | ||
US20030479317P | 17.06.2003 | ||
US20030480215P | 19.06.2003 | ||
US20030480376P | 19.06.2003 | ||
US20030493860P | 08.08.2003 | ||
US20030498634P | 28.08.2003 | ||
US20030503931P | 16.09.2003 | ||
WO2003US35712 | 10.11.2003 | ||
WO2004US03600 | 05.02.2004 | ||
US20040549896P | 02.03.2004 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004078130 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646644 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/515, A61K31/4015, A61K31/426, A61K31/428, A61K31/427, A61K31/341, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, C07K14/435 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP);
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61K31/4015 (EP);
A61K31/4166 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/495 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP);
A61K31/7088 (EP);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N9/00 (EP);
C12Q1/02 (EP);
C12Q1/25 (EP);
C12Q1/68 (EP);
C12Q1/70 (EP);
C12Y603/02019 (EP);
G01N33/50 (EP);
G01N33/569 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | C07K14/00, C12N9/00, C12N15/00, C12P21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/16] | C07K14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT POSH WECHSELWIRKENDE PROTEINE UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2006/16] | English: | POSH INTERACTING PROTEINS AND RELATED METHODS | [2006/16] | French: | PROTEINES D'INTERACTION POSH ET PROCEDES CONNEXES | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2004089302 (PROTEOLOGICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y] - ACHTERBERG VAN T A, "POSH 4,A NOVEL PUTATIVE TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR, INTERACTS WITH A SPECIFIC HUMAN SPROUTY 4 ISOFORM", BLOOD, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20011116), vol. 98, no. 11, PART 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 823A, XP001079229 [Y] 1,3-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - KEANE MACCON M ET AL, "cbl-3: A new mammalian cbl family protein", ONCOGENE, (19990603), vol. 18, no. 22, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 3365 - 3375, XP002376200 [Y] 1,3-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1202753 | [Y] - ETTENBERG SETH A ET AL, "Cbl-b-dependent coordinated degradation of the epidermal growth factor receptor signaling complex", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010720), vol. 276, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27677 - 27684, XP002376201 [Y] 1,3-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M102641200 | [Y] - SMIT L ET AL, "The Cbl family of signal transduction molecules", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ONCOGENESIS 1997 UNITED STATES, (1997), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 0893-9675, pages 359 - 379, XP009064975 [Y] 1,3-8 * abstract * | [A] - JISHAGE M ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF TARGET GENES FOR EWS/ATF-1 CHIMERIC TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR", ONCOGENE, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, (20030109), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 41 - 49, XP001152880 [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206074 | [Y] - KOKAME K ET AL, "HERP, A NEW UBIQUITIN-LIKE MEMBRANCE PROTEIN INDUCED BY ENDOPLASMIC RETICULUM STRESS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20001020), vol. 275, no. 42, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 32846 - 32853, XP002951095 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M002063200 | [DY] - SAI X ET AL, "Endoplasmic reticulum stress-inducible protein, Herp, enhances presenilin-mediated generation of amyloid [beta]-protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 12 APR 2002 UNITED STATES, (20020412), vol. 277, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 12915 - 12920, XP002426500 [DY] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M112372200 | [PA] - MCKENNA S ET AL, "Energetics and specificity of interactions within Ub Uev Ubc13 human ubiquitin conjugation complexes", BIOCHEMISTRY 08 JUL 2003 UNITED STATES, (20030708), vol. 42, no. 26, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 7922 - 7930, XP002426501 [PA] 1,3-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi034480t | [DY] - ULRICH H D, "Protein-protein interactions within an E2-RING finger complex: Implications for ubiquitin-dependent DNA damage repair", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 28 FEB 2003 UNITED STATES, (20030228), vol. 278, no. 9, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7051 - 7058, XP002426502 [DY] 1,3-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M212195200 | International search | [XP] - FIGUEROA C ET AL, "Akt2 Negatively Regulates Assembly of the POSH-MLK-JNK Signaling Complex.", THE J BIO CHEM., (20031128), vol. 278, no. 48, pages 47922 - 47927, XP002996244 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M307357200 | [X] - TAPON N ET AL, "A new Rac target POSH is an SH3-containing scaffold protein involved in the JNK and NF-kappaB signalling pathways.", THE EMBO JOURNAL., (1998), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 1395 - 1404, XP002250463 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.5.1395 | [X] - XU Z ET AL, "POSH acts as a scaffold for a multiprotein complex that mediates JNK activation in apoptosis.", J EMBO., (200301), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 252 - 261, XP002985544 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/cdg021 |