EP1603575 - NEMORUBICIN AS RADIOSENSITIZER IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION THERAPY AGAINST TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Italia S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERONI, Maria, Cristina, Rosa Via Correggio, 48 I-20149 Milan / IT | 02 /
PACCIARINI, Maria, Adele Via Degli Imbriani, 39 I-20158 Milan / IT | 03 /
SUARATO, Antonino Via Degli Imbriani, 39 I-MILAN 20158 / IT | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716607.9 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004EP50246 | Priority number, date | EP20030075781 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03075781 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004082579 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1603575 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/704, A61P35/00, A61K31/282 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP);
A61K31/704 (EP);
A61K41/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/282, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K41/00, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEMORUBICIN ALS STRAHLUNGSSENSIBILISATOR ZUSAMMEN MIT STRAHLENTHERAPIE GEGEN KREBS | [2005/50] | English: | NEMORUBICIN AS RADIOSENSITIZER IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION THERAPY AGAINST TUMORS | [2005/50] | French: | POLYTHERAPIE CONTRE DES TUMEURS COMPRENANT L'ADMINISTRATION DE NEMORUBICINE COMBINEE A UNE RADIOTHERAPIE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/46] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4672057 (BARGIOTTI ALBERTO [IT], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XD]US4710564 (OTAKE NOBORU [JP], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XD]GB2296495 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XD]GB2315067 (PHARMACIA SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO03082267 (PHARMACIA ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 4, line 21 *; | [X] - The combination of nemorubicin with cisplatin and mitomycin C is synergistic in experimental tumor models, EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, PAGE(S) S20, (200211), ISSN 0959-8049, XP004403486 [X] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - KABUTO M ET AL, [Antitumor effect of MX2, a new morpholino anthracycline against C6 glioma cells and its combination effect with photodynamic therapy in vitro], NO TO SHINKEI. BRAIN AND NERVE. OCT 1995, VOL. 47, NR. 10, PAGE(S) 969 - 973, (199510), ISSN 0006-8969, XP009033767 [X] 1-3,6-15 * abstract * | [X] - "Preclinical activity against liver metastases of Nemorubicin, a DNA-intercalating cytotoxic agent for the treatment of hepatocellular carcinoma", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200211), vol. 38, ISSN 0959-8049, page S19, XP004403483 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - "Properties of the new anthracycline derivative containing modified daunosamine moiety", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200211), vol. 38, ISSN 0959-8049, pages S19 - S20, XP004403485 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - BONNER J A ET AL, Doxorubicin decreases the repair of radiation-induced DNA damage, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION BIOLOGY 1990 UNITED KINGDOM, VOL. 57, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 55-64, (1990), ISSN 0020-7616, XP009033771 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - BONNER J A ET AL, "DOXORUBICIN ENHANCES RADIATION-INDUCED DNA DAMAGE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, BIOLOGY, PHYSICS, & 30TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THERAPEUTIC RADIOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY, NEW ORLEANS, LOU, (1988), vol. 15, no. SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0360-3016, page 163, XP009033770 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - WU LI-TEH, "Doxorubicin as radiation potentiator: Concurrent doxorubicin and radiation therapy interaction and its clinical applications", INFUSION CHEMOTHERAPY: IRRADIATION INTERACTIONS: PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATIONS TO ORGAN SALVAGE AND PREVENTION OF SECOND PRIMARY NEOPLASMS ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., PO BOX 211, SARA BURGERHARTSTRAAT 25, 1000 AE AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS; ELSEV, (1998), ISSN 0-444-82608-4, pages 147 - 151, XP002289046 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - JAGETIA GANESH CHANDRA ET AL, "Effect of doxorubicin on cell survival and micronuclei formation in HeLa cells exposed to different doses of gamma-radiation", STRAHLENTHERAPIE UND ONKOLOGIE, (200009), vol. 176, no. 9, ISSN 0179-7158, pages 422 - 428, XP002289047 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - CHENOUFI NORCHEN ET AL, "In vitro demonstration of synergy between radionuclide and chemotherapy", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (199805), vol. 39, no. 5, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 900 - 903, XP009033769 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * |