EP1604540 - METHOD, COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK ARRANGEMENT, COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK SERVER, TERMINAL, AND SOFTWARE MEANS FOR SELECTING AND CHANGING OPERATING MODES FOR PACKET-SWITCHED VOICE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSSELL, Mika Korpimaa 3 I FIN-02300 Espoo / FI | 02 /
KARPPANEN, Arto Vattuniemenkatu 4 D 64 FIN-00210 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
AALTONEN, Kari Jaalankatu 1 FIN-04430 Järvenpää / FI | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Määttä, Jukka Tapani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Määttä, Jukka Tapani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2008/43] | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2005/50] | Brax, Matti Juhani Oulun Patenttitoimisto Berggren Oy Ab Lentokatu 2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | Application number, filing date | 04716615.2 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004FI00117 | Priority number, date | US20030391409 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 391409 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084573 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604540 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604540 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKANORDNUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKSERVER, TERMINAL UND SOFTWAREMITTEL ZUM AUSWÄHLEN UND ÄNDERN VON BETRIEBSARTEN FÜR PAKETVERMITTELTE SPRACHVERBINDUNG | [2005/50] | English: | METHOD, COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK ARRANGEMENT, COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK SERVER, TERMINAL, AND SOFTWARE MEANS FOR SELECTING AND CHANGING OPERATING MODES FOR PACKET-SWITCHED VOICE CONNECTION | [2005/50] | French: | PROCEDE, AGENCEMENT DE RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION, SERVEUR DE RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL ET LOGICIELS PERMETTANT DE SELECTIONNER ET DE CHANGER DE MODES D'EXPLOITATION DE CONNEXION VOCALE COMMUTEE PAR PAQUETS | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2004 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 03.03.2012 | LU | 03.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GB | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2012 | ||
LU | 03.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GB | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 25.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0915596 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [X]EP0949832 (NORTEL MATRA CELLULAR [FR]); | [X]US6009325 (RETZER MICHAEL HERBERT [US], et al); | [X]US6459776 (AKTAS CHRISTOPH A [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0915596 |