EP1599868 - Method and device for the spectral reconstruction of an audio signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/48] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE SPECTRAL RECONSTRUCTION OF AN AUDIO SIGNAL | ||
[2009/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILIPPE, Pierrick 1, rue d'Abas F-35250 Chevaigne / FR | 02 /
RAULT, Jean-Bernard 26, avenue de Wachtendonk F-35690 Acigne / FR | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet - B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2005/48] | Maillet, Alain, et al Cabinet Le Guen & Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 F-35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04716626.9 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004FR00488 | Priority number, date | FR20030002730 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0302730 | [2005/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081918 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599868 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1599868 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L19/14 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,US);
G10L19/02 (KR);
G10L19/0208 (EP,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rekonstruktion des Spektrums eines Audiosignals | [2009/30] | English: | Method and device for the spectral reconstruction of an audio signal | [2009/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reconstruction spectrale d'un signal audio | [2009/30] |
Former [2005/48] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REKONSTRUKTION DES SPEKTRUMS EINES AUDIOSIGNALS | ||
Former [2005/48] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE SPECTRAL RECONSTRUCTION OF AN AUDIO SIGNAL | ||
Former [2005/48] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONSTRUCTION SPECTRALE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2009 | 18.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IE | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1037196 (MATRA NORTEL COMMUNICATIONS [FR]) [Y] 2,4,12,14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0010] , [0011] *; | [XY] - JIN A ET AL, "Scalable audio coder based on quantizer units of MDCT coefficients", 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, PROCEEDINGS, PHOENIX, AZ, USA, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990315), ISBN 0-7803-5041-3, pages 897 - 900, XP010328465 [X] 1,3,5-11,13,15-22 * abstract * [Y] 2,4,12,14 | [A] - ATKINSON I ET AL, "High quality split band LPC vocoder operating at low bit rates", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ICASSP-97, MUNICH, GERMANY, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, pages 1559 - 1562, XP010226105 [A] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596249 | [A] - MCCREE A ET AL, "An embedded adaptive multi-rate wideband speech coder", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP), SALT LAKE CITY, UT, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20010507), vol. 2 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7041-4, pages 761 - 764, XP002231188 [A] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.941026 | by applicant | EP1037196 | - JIN A ET AL., "Scalable audio coder based on quantizer units of MDCT coefficients", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, PROCEEDINGS, (19990315), pages 897 - 900 | - MR MARTIN DIETZ, "Audio Engineering Society, convention paper 5553", 112IEME CONVENTION AES |