EP1603457 - DEVICE FOR LOCATING AN INSTRUMENT WITHIN A BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN INSTRUMENT WITHIN A BODY | ||
[2012/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/50] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Sascha, Philips I. Prop. &Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
BORGERT, Jörn, Philips I. Property & Standars GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716664.0 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004IB00556 | Priority number, date | EP20030100567 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03100567 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078039 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603457 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61B5/00, A61B5/05, A61B8/00, A61B6/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANORDNUNG EINES INSTRUMENTS IN EINEM KÖRPER | [2012/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCATING AN INSTRUMENT WITHIN A BODY | [2012/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A LOCALISER UN INSTRUMENT DANS UN CORPS | [2012/40] |
Former [2005/50] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINES INSTRUMENTS IN EINEM KÖRPER | ||
Former [2005/50] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN INSTRUMENT WITHIN A BODY | ||
Former [2005/50] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINES A LOCALISER UN INSTRUMENT DANS UN CORPS | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2012 | 26.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5987349 (SCHULZ WALDEAN A [US]) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * abstract *; | [YD]US6264610 (ZHU QUING [US]) [YD] 1-3,8-10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 25; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2002115922 (WANER MILTON [US], et al) [Y] 1,7,10 * abstract *; | [Y]US6081741 (HOLLIS J MARCUS [US]) [Y] 1,7,10 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 32; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO03073934 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1,7 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]US5423321 (FONTENOT MARK G [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | - MINOSHIMA K ET AL, "Three-dimensional imaging using a femtosecond amplifying optical kerr gate", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (19991001), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1758 - 1762, XP000859865 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.602229 | by applicant | US6264610 |