EP1605039 - DENDRITIC CELL PRESENTING ALPHA-GLYCOSYLCERAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND A NTIGEN AND USABLE IN SUPPRESSING IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirin Pharma Kabushiki Kaisha 26-1, Jingumae 6-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/13] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERIZAWA, Isao 3, Miyahara-cho Takasaki-shi, Gunma 3701295 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Yasunori 6-26-1, Jingumae Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 3701295 / JP | 03 /
EHARA, Hiromi 3, Miyahara-cho Takasaki-shi, Gunma 3701295 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716785.3 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004JP02621 | Priority number, date | JP20030056109 | 03.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003056109 | [2005/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078957 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605039 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605039 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, C12N5/08, A61K35/12, A61P37/00, A61P37/06, A61P37/08 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/46433 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DENDRITISCHE ZELLE MIT ALPHA-GLYCOSYLCERAMID-DERIVAT UND ANTIGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON IMMUNREAKTIONEN | [2005/50] | English: | DENDRITIC CELL PRESENTING ALPHA-GLYCOSYLCERAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND A NTIGEN AND USABLE IN SUPPRESSING IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2005/50] | French: | CELLULE DENDRITIQUE PRESENTANT DES DERIVES DE ALPHA-GLYCOSYLCERAMIDE ET UN ANTIGENE ET UTILISABLE DANS LA SUPPRESSION DE LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2005 | Translation filed | 30.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | PL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0242433 ; | [A]JP2002284692 ; | [A]EP0988860 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]); | International search | [A]WO02056830 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al); |