EP1638512 - LIGANDS THAT BIND TO THE AMYLOID-BETA; PRECURSOR PEPTIDE AND RELATED MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM 201 West Seventh Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUDHOF, Thomas, C. 6516 Longfellow Drive Dallas, TX 75230 / US | 02 /
HO, Angela 150 Brookline Avenue 1003 Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
SUDHOF, Thomas, C. 6516 Longfellow Drive Dallas, TX 75230 / US | ||
02 /
HO, Angela 3402 Cole Avenue 241 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04716916.4 | 03.03.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US06400 | Priority number, date | US20030451574P | 03.03.2003 Original published format: US 451574 P | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004078135 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638512 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C07H21/00, C07K14/47, G01N33/53 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C07K14/8114 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
C07K2319/23 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C07K2319/41 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4709 (EP,US);
G01N2500/02 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIGANDEN, DIE AN AMYLOID-BETA BINDEN ; VORLÄUFER-PEPTID UND VERWANDTE MOLEKÜLE UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2006/13] | English: | LIGANDS THAT BIND TO THE AMYLOID-BETA; PRECURSOR PEPTIDE AND RELATED MOLECULES AND USES THEREOF | [2006/13] | French: | LIGANDS SE LIANT AU PEPTIDE PRECURSEUR BETA-AMYLOIDE, MOLECULES RELATIVES ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ICHTCHENKO K ET AL, "NEUROLIGIN 1: A SPLICE SITE-SPECIFIC LIGAND FOR BETA-NEUREXINS", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19950505), vol. 81, no. 3, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 435 - 443, XP002942769 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90396-8 | [A] - HATA Y ET AL, "SYNAPTIC VESICLE FUSION COMPLEX CONTAINS UNC-18 HOMOLOGUE BOUND TO SYNTAXIN", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, (19931125), vol. 366, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 347 - 351, XP002055934 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/366347a0 | International search | [X]EP1130094 (HELIX RES INST [JP]); | [X]JP2002017375 (HERIKKUSU KENKYUSHO KK); | [A]US5750502 (JESSELL THOMAS M [US], et al); | [A] - KLAR A. ET AL., "F-Spondin: A Gene Expression at High Levels in the Floor Plate Encodes a Secreted Protein That Promotes Neural Cell Adhesion and Neurite Extension", (19920403), vol. 69, pages 95 - 110, XP002042409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(92)90121-R | [A] - MIYAMOTO K. ET AL., "Isolation and Characterization of Vascular Smooth Muscle Cell Growth Promoting Factor from Bovine Ovarian Follicular Fluid and its cDNA Cloning from Bovine and Human Ovary", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (20010601), vol. 390, no. 1, pages 93 - 100, XP003014070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.2001.2367 | [A] - HO A. ET AL., "Binding of F-spondin to amyloid-beta precursor protein: A candidate amyloid beta precursor protein ligand that modulates amyloid-beta precursor protein cleavage", PNAS, (20040224), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 2548 - 2553, XP003014071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0308655100 |