EP1588454 - ANTENNA COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE DIPOLE OR DIPOLE-LIKE EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Correction of patent specification | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLLE, Manfred Rennbahnstrasse 9 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 02 /
SCHEYER, Andreas Bergweg 9 83104 Tuntenhausen / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04717091.5 | 04.03.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004EP02206 | Priority number, date | DE2003116564 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316564 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091050 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588454 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588454 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1588454 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/10, H01Q21/06, H01Q21/24 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H01Q21/26 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (EP,US);
H01Q21/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE MIT ZUMINDEST EINEM DIPOL ODER EINER DIPOLÄHNLICHEN STRAHLERANORDNUNG | [2005/43] | English: | ANTENNA COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE DIPOLE OR DIPOLE-LIKE EMITTING DEVICE | [2005/43] | French: | ANTENNE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN DIPOLE OU UN DISPOSITIF EMETTEUR DE TYPE DIPOLE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 03.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | CZ | 07.06.2006 | EE | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | PL | 07.06.2006 | RO | 07.06.2006 | SI | 07.06.2006 | SK | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | BG | 07.09.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 04.03.2007 | LU | 04.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2007 | ||
LU | 04.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 07.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0709913 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 10 *; | [X]US5708446 (LARAMIE DANIEL GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 22 *; | [X]US5821902 (KEEN KEITH M [GB]) [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 66 *; | [A]US5952983 (DEARNLEY RUSSELL W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,6,8 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 5 ** column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 39 *; | [X]US6037911 (BRANKOVIC VESELIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 37 *; | [A]DE19860121 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-5 * * column 4, line 9 - column 7, line 35 * |