EP1618495 - AUTOMATIC DATA CONSOLIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILD, Stefan, G. 130 Mitchell Road Somers, NY 10589 / US | 02 /
PAWLITZEK, René, A. Schlossbergstrasse 17 CH-8802 Kilchberg / CH | 03 /
RJAIBI, Walid 10 Monkhouse Road Markham, Ontario L6E 1E9 / CA | 04 /
STOLZE, Markus 13 Brook Street Mount Kisco, NY 10549 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
HILD, Stefan, G. 130 Mitchell Road Somers, NY 10589 / US | ||
02 /
PAWLITZEK, René, A. Schlossbergstrasse 17 CH-8802 Kilchberg / CH | |||
03 /
RJAIBI, Walid 10 Monkhouse Road Markham, Ontario L6E 1E9 / CA | |||
04 /
STOLZE, Markus Sustenweg 40 CH-3014 Bern / CH | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael c/o IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Postfach 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Klett, Peter Michael IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4 / Postfach 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 04717176.4 | 04.03.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004IB00669 | Priority number, date | EP20030405295 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03405295 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097677 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618495 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G06F16/254 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S707/99948 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE DATENKONSOLIDIERUNG | [2006/04] | English: | AUTOMATIC DATA CONSOLIDATION | [2006/04] | French: | CONSOLIDATION AUTOMATIQUE DE DONNEES | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 17.01.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5710917 (MUSA MARK ANTHONY [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US6151608 (ABRAMS HELENE G [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002107871 (WYZGA WOJCIECH J [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * |