EP1610689 - GUIDANCE OF INVASIVE MEDICAL DEVICES BY THREE DIMENSIONAL ULTRASONIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALGO, Ivan 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 02 /
SAVORD, Bernard 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 03 /
SCAMPINI, Steven 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 04 /
PESZYNSKI, Michael 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Roche, Denis, et al Société Civile SPID 33, rue de Verdun 92150 Suresnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Roche, Denis, et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/01] | Landousy, Christian Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04717192.1 | 04.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004IB00710 | Priority number, date | US20030458785P | 27.03.2003 Original published format: US 458785 P | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084737 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1610689 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/4245 (EP,US);
A61B8/4263 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00703 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/364 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNG INVASIVER MEDIZINISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN MITTELS DREIDIMENSIONALER ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNG | [2006/01] | English: | GUIDANCE OF INVASIVE MEDICAL DEVICES BY THREE DIMENSIONAL ULTRASONIC IMAGING | [2006/01] | French: | GUIDAGE DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX INVASIFS PAR IMAGERIE ULTRASONIQUE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/20] | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5817022 (VESELY IVAN [US]) [X] 15-17 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 4 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 52 * * column 12, line 39 - column 13, line 20 * * figures 1,5,11A *; | [X]US6019724 (GRONNINGSAETER AAGE [NO], et al) [X] 15-17 * column 4, line 23 - line 41 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 47 ** figure 3 *; | [X]US2002049375 (STROMMER GERA M [IL], et al) [X] 15-17 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraphs [0099] - [0101] * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1245191 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [X] 15-17 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * figure 1 * |