EP1604074 - A self-centring sliding bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | A SELF-CENTRING SLIDING BEARING | ||
[2012/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robinson Seismic IP Limited 69 Gracefield Road Lower Hutt / NZ | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Robinson Seismic Limited P.O Box 33-093, Petone, Gracefield Road Lower Hutt / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, William, Henry 9 Nikau Street Eastbourne Wellington / NZ | 02 /
GANNON, Christopher, Ross 201 Stratton Street Normandale Wellington / NZ | [2012/34] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
ROBINSON, William, Henry 9 Nikau Street, Eastbourne Wellington / NZ | ||
02 /
GANNON, Christopher, Ross 201 Stratton Street, Normandale Wellington / NZ | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04717908.0 | 05.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004NZ00045 | Priority number, date | NZ20030524611 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: NZ 52461103 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004079113 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604074 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604074 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/36, E04H9/02, E02D27/34, E01D19/04 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
E01D19/046 (EP,US);
E04B1/36 (KR);
E01D19/04 (EP,US);
E02D27/34 (EP,US);
E04H9/021 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Selbstzentrierendes Gleitlager | [2012/15] | English: | A self-centring sliding bearing | [2012/15] | French: | Palier coulissant à autocentrage | [2012/16] |
Former [2005/50] | SELBSTZENTRIERENDES GLEITLAGER | ||
Former [2005/50] | A SELF-CENTRING SLIDING BEARING | ||
Former [2005/50] | PALIER COULISSANT A AUTOCENTRAGE | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 30.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2004 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | GB | 05.03.2013 | IE | 05.03.2013 | LU | 05.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014643 (BAKKER JACOB F J) [X] 2-4 * page 1, column R, line 26 - page 2, column R, line 55; figures 1,4,6 * [Y] 5-7,9,11-14; | [Y]DE29503801U (HAIDERMETALL EDUARD HAIDER KG [DE]) [Y] 7,9,11-14* page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 14; figures 5,6 *; | [XY]WO0037823 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 5; | [XY]DE10145857 (HERTZFELDT ROGER [DE]) [X] 2 * abstract * [Y] 6,14 | International search | [X]WO02084030 (FINE CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]GB2099932 (FYFE EDWARD ROBERT); | [X]WO9415047 (LOGIADIS IOANNIS [GR], et al); | [X]FR2572446 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]EP0439272 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [X]JPH0931919 (KAIMON KK); | [X]JPH1038022 (SHINDO TOMIHARU) | Examination | JPS6070276 |