EP1611363 - DEFLECTION LEVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHYLA, Thomas Gatower Str. 299 14089 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LÖBNER, Friedrich Fidicinstr. 32a 10965 Berlin / DE | [2006/01] | Application number, filing date | 04718254.8 | 08.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004DE00490 | Priority number, date | DE2003116722 | 09.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316722 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004092604 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611363 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611363 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/12 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
F16D1/12 (EP,US);
H01H3/46 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1625 (EP,US);
Y10T74/206 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [2006/29] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMLENKHEBEL | [2006/01] | English: | DEFLECTION LEVER | [2006/01] | French: | LEVIER DE RENVOI | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1421408 (GREINER COLLYER LOUIS) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 9 - line 20 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3255641 (RUSSELL WILLIAM J) [X] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2637953 (GERSTEEN [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 1 - line 12 * * page 7, line 5 - line 14 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6053076 (BARNES BENNY R [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE20017252U |