EP1606796 - DISTRIBUTED SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONNE, Jean 53, rue du Pré de Saint-Maur F-22700 Perros Guirec / FR | 02 /
PETIT, Jean-Pierre 10, lot Zant Erwan F-22220 Minihy Tréguier / FR | 03 /
BRISARD, Patrick 5, allée du Cèdre F-92320 Châtillon / FR | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04718327.2 | 08.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004FR00547 | Priority number, date | FR20030003614 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303614 | [2005/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088637 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606796 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606796 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/28 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
G10L15/32 (EP,US);
G10L15/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTES SPRACHERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/51] | English: | DISTRIBUTED SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD | [2005/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE DE PAROLE DISTRIBUEE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | IE | 03.06.2009 | IT | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | PL | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CY | 03.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IT | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
CZ | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6122613 (BAKER JAMES K [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-15,17-19 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,10,11,15,16; | [DA]US6487534 (THELEN ERIC [US], et al) [DA] 1-19* the whole document *; | [Y]US2003004720 (GARUDADRI HARINATH [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,10,11,15,16 * abstract * |