EP1615059 - SMALL ZOOMING LENS, AND DIGITAL CAMERA AND VIDEO CAMERA BOTH HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Katsu 6-8-10, Ao, Matsubara-shi Osaka 580-0043 / JP | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718439.5 | 08.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004JP02987 | Priority number, date | JP20030070824 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003070824 | [2006/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081631 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615059 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/173 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G02B15/144113 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/009 (KR);
G02B15/144109 (KR);
G02B3/0062 (KR);
G02B3/0087 (KR);
G02B3/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | G02B15/16, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/25] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEINE ZOOM-LINSE UND DIGITALKAMERA UND VIDEOKAMERA BEIDES DAMIT | [2006/02] | English: | SMALL ZOOMING LENS, AND DIGITAL CAMERA AND VIDEO CAMERA BOTH HAVING SAME | [2006/02] | French: | PETITE LENTILLE A VARIATION DE FOCALE AINSI QU'APPAREIL PHOTO ET CAMERA VIDEO NUMERIQUES COMPRENANT TOUS DEUX CETTE LENTILLE | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | Translation filed | 24.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 01.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000121940 (CANON KK) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2000305016 (CANON KK) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6178049 (MUKAIYA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]JP2001116996 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH09281391 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2000121940 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2000305016 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2000347103 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2001051196 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2001066717 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2001116996 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2001228394 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2002131638 (CANON KK) |