EP1603662 - PURIFICATION OF FLUIDS WITH NANOMATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seldon Technologies, LLC 7 Everett Lane Windsor, VT 05089 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Seldon Technologies, LLC 4 The Green Woodstock, VT 05091 / US | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Seldon Technologies LLC 4 The Green Woodstock, VT 05091 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Christopher, H. 16 Pine Street Windsor, Vermont 05089 / US | 02 /
CUMMINGS, Alan, G. 46 Reeves Road Hartland, VT 05049 / US | 03 /
STAROSTIN, Mikhail, Y. 44 East Wheelock Street Hanover, NH 03755 / US | 04 /
HONSINGER, Charles, P. 48 Autumn Lane Windsor, VT 05089 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
COOPER, Christopher, H. 7 Everett Lane, Door 18, P.O.Box 710 Windsor, Vermont 05089 / US | ||
02 /
CUMMINGS, Alan, G. 46 Reeves Road Hartland, VT 05049 / US | |||
03 /
STAROSTIN, Mikhail, Y. 44 East Wheelock Street Hanover, NH 03755 / US | |||
04 /
HONSINGER, Charles, P. 48 Autumn Lane Windsor, VT 05089 / US | |||
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
COOPER, Christopher, H. 40 The Village Green Windsor, VT 05089 / US | ||
02 /
CUMMINGS, Alan, G. 46 Reeves Road Hartland, VT 05049 / US | |||
03 /
STAROSTIN, Mikhail, Y. 44 East Wheelock Street Hanover, NH 03755 / US | |||
04 /
HONSINGER, Charles, P. 48 Autumn Lane Windsor, VT 05089 / US | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04718476.7 | 08.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US06811 | Priority number, date | US20030452530P | 07.03.2003 Original published format: US 452530 P | US20030468109P | 06.05.2003 Original published format: US 468109 P | US20030499375P | 03.09.2003 Original published format: US 499375 P | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080578 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603662 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603662 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, C02F1/44, B01D69/14 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C12H1/0416 (EP,US);
A61L2/0082 (EP,US);
A61L2/23 (EP,US);
B01D15/00 (EP,US);
B01D53/228 (EP,US);
B01D67/0046 (EP,US);
B01D67/0072 (EP,US);
B01D67/0076 (EP,US);
B01D69/141 (EP);
B01D71/021 (EP);
B01D71/0212 (US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/205 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28007 (EP,US);
B01J20/28026 (EP,US);
B01J20/28028 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/15 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C12H1/0408 (EP,US);
B01D2323/34 (EP,US);
B01D2323/35 (EP,US);
B01D2323/36 (EP,US);
B01D2323/46 (EP,US);
B01D2325/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/288 (EP,US);
C02F2101/103 (EP,US);
C02F2305/08 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249955 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249956 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249958 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNG VON FLUIDEN MEDIEN MIT NANOMATERIALIEN | [2005/50] | English: | PURIFICATION OF FLUIDS WITH NANOMATERIALS | [2005/50] | French: | PURIFICATION DE FLUIDES AVEC DES NANOMATERIAUX | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07014878.8 / EP1852176 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | PL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | LU | 08.03.2008 | IE | 10.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
LU | 08.03.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LU | 08.03.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
PL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6157043 (MIYAMOTO YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 32 - line 62; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002150524 (SMALLEY RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-140* the whole document *; | [XP]US6538262 (CRESPI VINCENT HENRY [US], et al) [XP] 1,2 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0039]; claims 1,2 * |