EP1611286 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AN ABSORBENT FIBRE PRODUCT AND CORRESPONDING ABSORBENT FIBRE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAUERESSIG GMBH & CO. Gutenbergstrasse 1 - 3 48691 Vreden / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUERESSIG, Kilian Lünten Nork 123 48691 Vreden / DE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718616.8 | 09.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004DE00452 | Priority number, date | DE2003112758 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10312758 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083523 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611286 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611286 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21H25/06 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
D21H25/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ABSORBIERENDES FASERPRODUKT UND ABSORBIERENDES FASERPRODUKT | [2006/01] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AN ABSORBENT FIBRE PRODUCT AND CORRESPONDING ABSORBENT FIBRE PRODUCT | [2006/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT FIBREUX ABSORBANT ET PRODUIT FIBREUX ABSORBANT | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.08.2006 | CZ | 30.08.2006 | EE | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | FR | 30.08.2006 | GB | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | PL | 30.08.2006 | RO | 30.08.2006 | SI | 30.08.2006 | SK | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | BG | 30.11.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | HU | 01.03.2007 | AT | 09.03.2007 | LU | 09.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 30.08.2006 | |
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
HU | 01.03.2007 | ||
AT | 09.03.2007 | ||
LU | 09.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
AT | 09.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
AT | 09.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
AT | 09.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
PL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0671504 (SCHWEITZER JACOB [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,12 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE19639491 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 3, line 32 - line 37; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0989231 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,8,13,14* the whole document * |