EP1603389 - SURFACE SANITIZING COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED ANTIMICROBIAL PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pureific Corp. 7237 Oak Ridge Highway, Suite A Knoxville, TN 37931 / US | [2008/02] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Xantech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 7327, Oak Ridge Highway, Knoxville Tennessee 37931 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEES, H., Craig 1006 Wyndham Way Apt. 1517 Knoxville, TN 37923 / US | 02 /
WACHTER, Eric 138 Baypath Drive Oak Ridge, TN 37830 / US | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Hill, Christopher Michael, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Hill, Christopher Michael, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04718798.4 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US07021 | Priority number, date | US20030453324P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453324 P | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080179 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603389 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/02, A01N31/16, A61L2/18, // A01N31/02, A01N63/02, A01N59/12, A01N33/12, A01N31/16, A01N31/12, A01N31/08, A01N31/16, A01N31/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A61L2/18 (EP,US);
A01N31/02 (EP,US);
A01N31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N31/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENHYGIENISIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER ANTIMIKROBIELLER WIRKUNG | [2005/50] | English: | SURFACE SANITIZING COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED ANTIMICROBIAL PERFORMANCE | [2005/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DESINFECTION SUPERFICIELLE A PERFORMANCE ANTIMICROBIENNE AMELIOREE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 19.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001261550 ; | [X]JP2001010904 ; | [X]US4197318 (SIPOS TIBOR [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-17 * column 2, lines 51-66 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 58 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 8 * * example 1; table I * * examples 2,4-6 *; | [X]DE3117792 (SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * page 8, line 1, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 3; example 4 *; | [X]EP0190797 (VOIT JOHN KENNETH) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,16,17 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 23; example 1 *; | [X]GB2187097 (UNILEVER PLC) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,16,17 * page 1, lines 27-50; examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP0331489 (PARKE DAVIS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13,16,17 * page 2, lines 25-29,40-48 * * examples 1,8 *; | [X]EP0375827 (SARAYA KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-12,15-17 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 4; examples 1,11; table 9 *; | [X]WO9215299 (BLOOM LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14-17 * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 6 ** page 24, lines 31-34; examples 1,13,16,22,23,26,35-38,42-57 *; | [X]WO9700668 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4,7-12,15-17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, lines 11-13 * * page 8, lines 9-23 * * page 27, lines 11-30; examples 6,14 * * claim 7 *; | [X]WO9857616 (CHURCH & DWIGHT CO INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8-13,16,17 * page 4, lines 2-13 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 6; examples II,III *; | [X]WO0030601 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,12-17 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 22 * * page 12, line 6 - page 13, line 11 * * page 14, lines 1-5; examples I-IV,VI,VIIa *; | [X]WO0078275 (DIAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 6 * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 33 * * page 24, line 1 - page 26, line 21 * * page 44, line 19 - page 45, line 27 * * table 3 * * examples 4,15-18,27; tables 4-6 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 10, Database accession no. 2002-069740, XP002286744 & JP2001261550 A 20010926 (ADEKA CLEAN AID KK) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,14,17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 30, Database accession no. 2001-285372, XP002286745 & JP2001010904 A 20010116 (FUMAKILA KK) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,16,17 * abstract * |