EP1606359 - AQUEOUS MAGNETIC INK CHARACTER RECOGNITION INK-JET INK COMPOSITION CONTAINING A COMBINATION OF SPECIAL SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nu-kote International, Inc. 200 Beasley Drive Franklin, Tennessee 37064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Nu-kote International, Inc. 200 Beasley Drive Franklin Tennessee 37064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCELLIGOTT, Michael, J. 633 Flower City Pk. Rochester, NY 14615 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Donald, E., Jr. 28 Union Hill Dr. Spencerport, NY 14559 / US | 03 /
COUTTA, Ronald, E. 1332 North Hampton Circle Cookeville, TN 38501 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House, 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 04718865.1 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US07200 | Priority number, date | US20030397912 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: US 397912 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004086286 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1606359 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
C09D11/326 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE MAGNETISCHE TINTE FÜR DEN TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK MIT EINER KOMBINATION SPEZIELLER TENSIDE | [2005/51] | English: | AQUEOUS MAGNETIC INK CHARACTER RECOGNITION INK-JET INK COMPOSITION CONTAINING A COMBINATION OF SPECIAL SURFACTANTS | [2005/51] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE AQUEUSE POUR RECONNAISSANCE DE CARACTERES MAGNETIQUES CONTENANT UNE COMBINAISON DE TENSIOACTIFS SPECIAUX | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 10.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2007 | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59199780 ; | [DX]US4026713 (SAMBUCETTI CARLOS JUAN, et al) [DX] 5,6 * column 1, lines 1-16 ** claims 1-16 *; | [PX]WO2004003087 (NU KOTE INT INC [US]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2004003088 (NU KOTE INT INC [US]) [PX] 1-7 * examples C,D *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 17, Database accession no. 1985-101496, XP002508375 & JPS59199780 A 19841112 (PENTEL KK) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column A * | International search | [XT]US6726759 (MCELLIGOTT MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y]US5026427 (MITCHELL ROBERT D [US], et al) |