EP1601646 - 2-SUBSTITUTED VITAMIN D ANALOGUES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K.U. Leuven Research and Development Groot Begijnhof 58 3000 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states K.U. Leuven Research and Development Groot Begijnhof 58 3000 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUILLON, Roger Schoonzichtlaan 22 B-3020 Winksele / BE | 02 /
VERSTUYF, Annemieke Patrijzenlaan 7 B-3050 Oud-Heverlee / BE | 03 /
VANDEWALLE, Maurits Nekkersberglaan 7 B-9000 Gent / BE | 04 /
DE CLERCQ, Pierre Vijvermeerspark 17 B-9000 Gent / BE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goen & Co, Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 04718886.7 | 10.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004BE00037 | Priority number, date | GB20030005332 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0305332 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004080922 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601646 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601646 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00, A61K31/59, A61P35/00, A61P19/08, A61P19/10 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-SUBSTITUIERTE VITAMIN D ANALOGEN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2005/49] | English: | 2-SUBSTITUTED VITAMIN D ANALOGUES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USES | [2005/49] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA VITAMINE D ET LEURS UTILISATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 29.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2010 | 10.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2004 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | |
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | |
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | |
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | |
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 10.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | |
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CZ | 27.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5936105 (PAAREN HERBERT E [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-19 * column 4, line 35 * * column 3, lines 61-63 * * column 25, lines 33-63 *; | [Y] - SICINSKI RAFAL R ET AL, "2-Ethyl and 2-ethylidene analogues of 1alpha,25-dihydroxy-19-norvita min D3: Synthesis, conformational analysis, biological activities, and docking to the modeled rVDR ligand binding domain", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20020801), vol. 45, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3366 - 3380, XP002291416 [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-19 * page 3367; examples 4-7 * * page 3372; table 1 * * page 3373; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm020007m | [Y] - POSNER GARY H ET AL, "2,2-disubstituted analogues of the natural hormone 1alpha,25-dihydroxyvitamin D3: Chemistry and biology", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200207), vol. 10, no. 7, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 2353 - 2365, XP002291417 [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-19 * page 2354; examples 8a-d * * page 2357, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(02)00058-5 |