EP1602167 - DC-DC SWITCHING CONVERTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DET International Holding Limited Scotia Center, 4th Floor George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2007/44] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states DET International Holding Limited Scotia Center, 4th Floor George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JITARU, Ionel, Dan 7820 Placita Sin Mentiras Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 02 /
BUCHERU, Bogdan-Tudor Crinul de Padure Street, No.3 Building G6, Suite 36 R-Bucharest / RO | 03 /
HRISCU, Lucian Str. Izvorul Rece, No.3 BL. S14, SC.A, ET 10 AP 128, Sect. 3 R-Bucharest / RO | 04 /
DAVILA, Marco, Antonio, Jr. 4754 N. Coop Canyon Place Tucson, AZ 85750 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | ||
Former [2005/49] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach CH-3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 04718899.0 | 10.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004CH00140 | Priority number, date | US20030453630P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453630 P | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004082112 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602167 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1602167 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158, H02M3/28 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
H02M1/12 (EP,US);
H02J1/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROM-GLEICHSTROM-SCHALTWANDLEREINRICHTUNG | [2005/49] | English: | DC-DC SWITCHING CONVERTER DEVICE | [2005/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF CONVERTISSEUR COMMUTATEUR CC-CC | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | CZ | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | PL | 31.10.2007 | RO | 31.10.2007 | SI | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | BG | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | IE | 10.03.2008 | LU | 10.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | HU | 01.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
LU | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
HU | 01.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
LU | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
IE | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5045712 (BAGGENSTOSS PAUL M [US]) [A] 6,10* figure 1 *; | [X]US5691889 (BAZINET JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 5 - line 19 * |