|
20.07.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |