|
27.10.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |