Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8021417 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2011 | B2 | US2008249612 | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79744904 | 10.03.2004 | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | US13983608 | 16.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7402171 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2008 | B2 | US2004225352 | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79744904 | 10.03.2004 | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4624984B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2011 | B2 | JP2006519655 | 31.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2168536 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B1 | EP2168536 | 31.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | EP04719210 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009201790 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009201790 | 05.05.2009 | AU2004220576 | 10.03.2004 | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004220576B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2009 | B2 | AU2004220576 | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1603492 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | B1 | EP1603492 | 14.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE452601T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2518867 | 20.09.2011 | C | CA2518867 | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004024766D1 | 04.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | WO2004US07219 | 10.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004080352 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45424903 | 12.03.2003 | US48813803 | 16.07.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2168536 | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.11.2010 |