EP1606448 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casar Drahtseilwerk Saar GmbH Casarstrasse 1 66459 Kirkel / DE | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERREET, Roland Grünenthaler Strasse 40A 52072 Aachen / DE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Bernhardt, Reinhold, et al Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft mbB Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Bernhardt, Reinhold, et al Kobenhüttenweg 43 D-66123 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Bernhardt, Reinold, et al Kobenhüttenweg 43 D-66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 04719430.3 | 11.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004EP02516 | Priority number, date | DE2003110855 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10310855 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081280 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606448 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606448 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/16, D07B7/16 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
D07B1/068 (EP,US);
H01B13/02 (KR);
D07B5/005 (US);
D07B1/06 (KR);
D07B1/0693 (US);
D07B1/16 (US);
D07B1/165 (EP,US);
D07B5/007 (EP,US);
D07B7/027 (US);
D07B7/16 (EP,US);
H01B13/22 (KR);
H01B13/32 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES DRAHTSEILS | [2005/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CABLE | [2005/51] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN CABLE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2004 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | IT | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IE | 11.03.2014 | LU | 11.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.03.2004 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
SE | 27.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4120145 (CHIAPPETTA FERDINAND, et al) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 32 * [Y] 2; | [YA]EP1001075 (TEUFELBERGER SEIL GMBH [AT]) [Y] 2 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 3 * [A] 5; | [A]DE3723720 (DIETZ GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,9 * column 1, line 47 - line 52 * * column 3, line 13 - line 26 * * column 3, line 56 - line 60 * | Examination | US3130536 | by applicant | US4120145 | EP1001075 |