EP1608272 - CLIP APPLYING APPARATUS WITH ANGLED JAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARANYI, Ernest 170 Stepney Road Easton, CT 06612 / US | 02 /
WHITFIELD, Kenneth, H. 335 Norton Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/04] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04719757.9 | 11.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004US07401 | Priority number, date | US20030453581P | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 453581 P | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004080290 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608272 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608272 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/10 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2017/04] |
Former [2006/24] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CLIP-APPLIKATOR MIT ABGEWINKELTEM BACKEN | [2005/52] | English: | CLIP APPLYING APPARATUS WITH ANGLED JAW | [2005/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE POSE D'AGRAFE A MACHOIRE INCLINEE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16196530.6 / EP3170459 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3270745 (CHARLE WOOD ERNEST) [A] 6,8 * column 3, lines 22, 26-27, 59 * * column 4, lines 12,25,29; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US3463156 (MCDERMOTT EDWARD B, et al) [A] 8 * column 3, line 61; figures 2-5,7 *; | [A]US5547474 (KLOECKL TERRANCE [US], et al) [A] 6,12-14 * column 7, lines 21-23, 29-32; figures 6A, 6B, 8 *; | [XI]US5906625 (BITO SHIRO [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12-16 * column 33, paragraph 65 - column 39, line 65; figures 103A-113 * * column 28, lines 25-50; figures 79-82 * [I] 6-11,17; | [A]US6139555 (HART CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 6,8 * column 6, paragraphs 54-56 ** column 7, paragraphs 1-30; figures 2-8, 9b * | International search | [A]US5547474 ; | [X]US4967979 |