EP1606537 - MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILD, Horst Am Schlo 1 91238 Engelthal / DE | 02 /
WOHLRAB, Klaus Heinrich-Stöhr-Str. 5 91781 Weissenburg / DE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Frank, et al AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Thielmann, Frank, et al AUDI AG, Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04719934.4 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004EP02571 | Priority number, date | DE2003111638 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10311638 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004081417 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1606537 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H63/42 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H2059/084 (EP,US);
F16H2059/085 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0227 (EP,US);
F16H2300/14 (EP,US);
F16H59/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/25] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2005/51] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/51] | French: | AUTOMOBILE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3201440 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 5; claim 1 * * page 9 - page 10 *; | [X]DE19736406 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 6; figure 6 * |