EP1604952 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BISMUTH TITANATE FINE PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beppu, Yoshihisa, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | 02 /
Sunahara, Kazuo, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | 03 /
Tomonaga, Hiroyuki, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Kumiko, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04720139.7 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004JP03285 | Priority number, date | JP20030078134 | 20.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003078134 | [2005/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083122 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604952 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01G29/00, C01G23/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C01G29/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G23/00 (KR);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | C01G29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/26] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FEINEN WISMUT-TITANAT-TEILCHEN | [2005/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BISMUTH TITANATE FINE PARTICLE | [2005/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES FINES DE TITANATE DE BISMUTH | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | Translation filed | 15.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 08.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6008163 (STEINLAGE GREG A [US], et al) [A] 8* column 6, lines 32-44 *; | [XA] - RUSSEL C ET AL, "Crystallization of Bi4Ti3O12 from glasses in the system Bi2O3/TiO2/B2O3", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199711), vol. 221, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 10 - 17, XP004102658 [X] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(97)00306-2 | [A] - KOJIMA S ET AL, "Crystallization of amorphous bismuth titanate", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200111), vol. 293-295, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 250 - 254, XP004320637 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(01)00828-6 | International search | [X]JPS6186423 (MITSUBISHI MINING & CEMENT CO); | [A]JPS6033216 (TAIYO YUDEN KK); | [A]JPS63100930 (KURATOMI TATSURO); | [A]JPH07202295 (SHARP KK) |