EP1604981 - NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Rena, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
TAKAOKA, Yoshikazu, Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
SHIBAYAMA, Shiro c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04720257.7 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004JP03333 | Priority number, date | JP20030070347 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003070347 | JP20030385683 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003385683 | [2005/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080966 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604981 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/46, C07D211/74, C07D211/58, C07D211/62, C07D211/32, C07D211/66, C07D211/22, C07D211/34, C07D211/72, C07D241/04, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/10, C07D401/14, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D487/08, A61K31/403, A61K31/445, A61K31/4468 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C07D211/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4468 (KR);
A61K31/45 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D211/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/58 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/62 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/66 (EP,US);
C07D211/72 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/74 (EP,US);
C07D241/04 (EP,US);
C07D295/108 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STICKSTOFFHALTIGE HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE UND ARZNEIMITTEL, DIE DIESE ALS WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTEN | [2005/50] | English: | NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2005/50] | French: | DERIVES HETEROCYCLIQUES RENFERMANT DE L'AZOTE ET MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT CES DERIVES COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | Translation filed | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 02.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 28.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP11158323.3 / EP2385040 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO0224636 [ ] (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [X] - MCCLELLAN, WILLIAM ET AL, "Preparation of N-arylcarbonyl- and heteroarylcarbonyl benzenesulfonamide inhibitors of Bcl-Xl and Bcl-2 as promoters of apoptosis", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:240717, URL: STN, XP002503148 [X] 1-9,11 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH04356462 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA); | [X]JP2000128782 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [X]JP2001518505 ; | [XP]WO2004026873 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) | Examination | WO9901127 | EP1236726 | by applicant | WO9917773 | WO0140227 | US6391865 | EP1236726 | WO02102787 | WO03070242 |