30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
13.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
16.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
04.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
22.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
08.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
30.05.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.12.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2007 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
15.12.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
14.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.05.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] |
01.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.11.2005 |
Deletion: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
15.11.2005 |
New entry: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
04.11.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
04.11.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
01.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|