EP1606716 - CROSSBAR SWITCH, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2006/29] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAOI, Junichi, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | 02 /
OHTO, Tomohiro, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04721012.5 | 16.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004JP03497 | Priority number, date | JP20030081258 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003081258 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004086242 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606716 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606716 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F15/173, H04L12/56 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H04L49/101 (EP,KR,US);
G06F15/173 (KR);
H04L49/254 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CROSSBAR-VERMITTLUNGSSTELLE, ZUGEHÖRIGES BETRIEBSSTEUERUNGVERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM | [2006/08] | English: | CROSSBAR SWITCH, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION THEREOF | [2005/51] | French: | COMMUTATEUR CROSSBAR, PROCEDE ET LOGICIEL POUR CONTROLER SON OPERATION | [2006/08] |
Former [2005/51] | CROSSBAR-SCHALTER, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR STEUERUNG SEINESBETRIEBS | ||
Former [2005/51] | AUTOCOMMUTATEUR CROSSBAR, PROCEDES ET LOGICIELS POUR EN COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | BE | 19.07.2006 | CH | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | CZ | 19.07.2006 | EE | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | IT | 19.07.2006 | LI | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | PL | 19.07.2006 | RO | 19.07.2006 | SI | 19.07.2006 | SK | 19.07.2006 | TR | 19.07.2006 | BG | 19.10.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | ES | 30.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | HU | 20.01.2007 | IE | 16.03.2007 | LU | 16.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CY | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
IE | 16.03.2007 | ||
LU | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
EE | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
IE | 16.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
RO | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
PL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
BG | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 19.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4365292 (BARNES GEORGE H, et al) [X] 1,4-18 * column 9, line 41 - column 11, line 30 * * figures 6,7 * [A] 2,3; | [X]WO9308658 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 16, line 1 - page 21, line 6 * * figures 11-13 *; | [XA] - BERNHARD P J ET AL, "USING THE DUAL PATH PROPERTY OF OMEGA NETWORKS TO OBTAIN CONFLICT-FREE MESSAGE ROUTING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE INC, NEW YORK, US, (19911001), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1045-9219, pages 503 - 507, XP000235822 [X] 1,4-18 * Section: "II. THE OMEGA NETWORK"; page 503, column R - page 504, column R * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/71.97906 |