EP1613418 - PLATE FILTRATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A3 Abfall-Abwasser-Anlagentechnik GmbH Magdeburger Strasse 16b 45881 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Steffen Hans-Böckler-Strasse 25 45655 Recklinghausen / DE | 02 /
BRÜSS, Ulrich Eschkamp 20 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Vomberg, Friedhelm Schulstrasse 8 D-42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04721462.2 | 18.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004DE00553 | Priority number, date | DE2003117853 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10317853 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091755 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613418 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613418 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/08, C02F3/12, B01D65/08, B01D69/06 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B01D65/02 (EP);
B01D63/082 (EP,US);
B01D61/18 (EP);
B01D63/00 (EP);
B01D63/081 (EP);
B01D65/08 (EP);
B01D2315/06 (EP);
B01D2321/04 (EP);
B01D2321/10 (EP);
C02F1/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENFILTRATIONSMODUL | [2006/02] | English: | PLATE FILTRATION MODULE | [2006/02] | French: | MODULE DE FILTRAGE A PLAQUES | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.10.2006 | CZ | 18.10.2006 | EE | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | FR | 18.10.2006 | GB | 18.10.2006 | IE | 18.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | PL | 18.10.2006 | RO | 18.10.2006 | SI | 18.10.2006 | SK | 18.10.2006 | TR | 18.10.2006 | BG | 18.01.2007 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | ES | 29.01.2007 | AT | 18.03.2007 | LU | 18.03.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | HU | 19.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
FR | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
LU | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
HU | 19.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
FR | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
FR | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
RO | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
PL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 18.10.2006 | |
SI | 18.10.2006 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 18.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06218247 ; | [X]JPH11285689 ; | [A]JPH0985064 ; | [A]JPH07299339 ; | [X]WO9506514 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al); | [PA]DE10151833 (3A ABWASSER ABFALL [DE]); | [PA]WO03059494 (TRIPLE I [US]) |