25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
04.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
14.09.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
09.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
15.09.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
08.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.06.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
21.04.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
25.11.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
13.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|