Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1613418 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2006 | B1 | EP1613418 | 11.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10317853 | 16.04.2003 | WO2004DE00553 | 18.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004001809D1 | 30.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10317853 | 16.04.2003 | WO2004DE00553 | 18.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004091755 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10317853 | 16.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE342763T | 15.11.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10317853 | 16.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10317853 | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10317853 | 16.04.2003 |