EP1740830 - PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robinson, Philip West Oak Lodge, The Barn Woolton Hill Newbury, Berkshire RG20 9UX / GB | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04721933.2 | 19.03.2004 | [2007/02] | WO2004GB01172 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090787 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740830 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740830 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B33/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
F04B33/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPE | [2007/02] | English: | PUMP | [2007/02] | French: | POMPE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | BE | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | CZ | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | EE | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IT | 29.04.2009 | PL | 29.04.2009 | RO | 29.04.2009 | SI | 29.04.2009 | SK | 29.04.2009 | TR | 29.04.2009 | BG | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | HU | 30.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CY | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
HU | 30.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CY | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4842290 (ALIOTO KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - column 3, line 39 * [Y] 1,3; | [X]US5137430 (ALIOTO KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 17 - column 4, line 23; figure - *; | [Y]US5347913 (STEPNER DAVID E [US]) [Y] 1* abstract *; | [XY]US5499858 (HER JERN-SHONG [TW]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1; | [XY]DE20212893U (HEPFNER HARRY [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * page 6, line 9 - page 6, line 21 * [Y] 3 |