EP1616417 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTELLPROP LIMITED P.O. Box 626 National Westminster House Le Truchot St Peter Port Guernsey Channel Islands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states INTELLPROP LIMITED P.O. Box 626, National Westminster House, Le Truchot St Peter Port Guernsey Channel Islands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Jeffrey 53 Kiln Road Fareham, Hampshire PO16 70H / GB | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Pilch, Adam John Michael D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04721947.2 | 19.03.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004GB01224 | Priority number, date | GB20030006937 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0306937 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004086701 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616417 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04Q7/22 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
H04W88/184 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP);
H04L51/48 (EP);
H04W4/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2006/03] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2006/03] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SERVICES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9912364 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-34* page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 32 *; | [X]US6292669 (MEURONEN TIMO [FI], et al) [X] 1-34 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 55 * * column 4, line 57 - column 7, line 47 *; | [X]WO03019959 (SAGE AGENT NETWORKS PTE LTD [SG], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, line 12 - page 11, line 15 * * page 12, line 1 - page 17, line 4 * * page 19, line 12 - page 20, line 13 * |