EP1614316 - METHOD AND CORRESPONDING MOBLE RADIO DEVICE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LOCATION-RELATED SERVICE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/02] | METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LOCATION-RELATED SERVICE INFORMATION | ||
[2009/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKMANN, Mark Helene-Engelbrecht-Str. 107 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
ECKERT, Michael Oderblick 6 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
GOTTSCHALK, Thomas Venusstr. 71 12524 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Gunnar Kapellenweg 15 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2009/39] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
BECKMANN, Mark Helene-Engelbrecht-Str. 107 38124 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
ECKERT, Michael Oderblick 6 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
03 /
GOTTSCHALK, Thomas Venusstr. 71 12524 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
SCHMIDT, Gunnar Kapellenweg 15 78502 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | |||
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
BECKMANN, Mark Helene-Engelbrecht-Str. 107 38124 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
ECKERT, Michael Hilsstr.1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
03 /
GOTTSCHALK, Thomas Venusstr. 71 12524 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
SCHMIDT, Gunnar Kapellenweg 15 78502 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04722288.0 | 22.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP03025 | Priority number, date | DE2003117143 | 14.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10317143 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091240 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1614316 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614316 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
H04W4/20 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/29] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENTSPRECHENDE MOBILFUNKANORDNUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON ORTSBEZOGENEN DIENST-INFORMATIONEN | [2009/34] | English: | METHOD AND CORRESPONDING MOBLE RADIO DEVICE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LOCATION-RELATED SERVICE INFORMATION | [2009/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF MOBILE RADIO CORRESPONDANT DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE RELATIVES A UN LIEU | [2009/34] |
Former [2006/02] | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON ORTSBEZOGENEN DIENST-INFORMATIONEN | ||
Former [2006/02] | METHOD FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LOCATION-RELATED SERVICE INFORMATION | ||
Former [2006/02] | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE RELATIVES A UN LIEU | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6529740 (GANUCHEAU JR CHARLES JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 37 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 48 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]US2003003909 (KERONEN SEPPO [AU], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO0101711 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 4 - page 6, line 20 * * page 10, line 20 - page 14, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1213939 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003045314 (BURGAN JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 * |