EP1655269 - METHOD OF FABRICATING MOLD FOR GLASS PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Shuji, 206, 4-22, Hachiman 1-chome Aoba-kuSendai-shi Miyagi 980-0871 / JP | 02 /
ESASHI, Masayoshi, 11-9, Yagiyama-minami 1-chome Taihaku-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 982-0807 / JP | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04722391.2 | 22.03.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004JP03861 | Priority number, date | JP20030144363 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003144363 | [2006/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103920 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655269 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03B11/00, B81C1/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
B81C99/009 (EP,US);
C03B11/082 (EP,US);
C03B11/086 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B37/001 (EP,US);
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
B81C2201/034 (EP,US);
C03B2215/22 (EP,US);
C03B2215/32 (EP,US);
C03B2215/412 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/963 (EP,US);
C04B2237/083 (EP,US);
C04B2237/123 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/568 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/35] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FORM FÜR EINE GLASPRESSE | [2006/19] | English: | METHOD OF FABRICATING MOLD FOR GLASS PRESS | [2006/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MOULE POUR MOULAGE MECANIQUE DU VERRE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2005 | Translation filed | 16.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6452622 (CANON KK) [A] 8-10 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]JPH09227139 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN) [A] 8-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1179757 (CANON KK) [A] 8-10 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2001064024 (NIKON CORP) [X] 8-11 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * | International search | [A]JPH0512722 (TOHOKU NAKATANI KK); | [A]JPH09132418 (HOOYA PRECISION KK); | [A]JPH07257933 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) |