EP1730329 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE ELECTROGALVANIC COATING OF METAL ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glomax S.R.L. Via del Commercio 46 20040 Bellusco / IT | For all designated states LM Finishing Systems S.R.L. Via Strada del Confine 35/a 36056 Belvedere diTezze sul Brenta / IT | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPINA, Umberto Via Torri Bianche 5 I-20059 Vimercate / IT | 02 /
LANDO, Walter Via Strada del Confine 35 I-36056 Belvedere di Tezze sul Brenta / IT | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04722634.5 | 23.03.2004 | [2006/50] | WO2004IT00145 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090647 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730329 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/22, C25D17/24, C25D19/00 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
C25D17/00 (EP,US);
C25D17/22 (EP,US);
C25D17/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | 18.10.2006 | LT | 18.10.2006 | LV | 18.10.2006 | MK | 18.10.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROGALVANISCHEN BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLISCHEN TEILEN | [2006/50] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE ELECTROGALVANIC COATING OF METAL ITEMS | [2006/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DEPOSER UNE COUCHE ELECTROGALVANIQUE SUR DES ARTICLES EN METAL | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2004 | Translation filed | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2013 | 31.03.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19932524 (WMV APP BAU GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * page 2, lines 24-29,36-60,66-68 * * page 3, lines 19-35,47-56 * * page 4, lines 36-48 * * page 6, lines 18-38 * * figure - *; | [XY]DE3230108 (WMV APPARATEBAU ALOIS MUELLER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure - * * claim . * [Y] 4-6,9,10; | [IY]DE3121397 (WEININGER LOTHAR, et al) [I] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 29 * * figure - * [Y] 4-6,9,10; | [IA]DE10161086 (WMV APPBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] - [0010] - [0022] , [0023] * * figure - * [A] 5,6,9,10; | [A]US4392936 (STOEGER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 7,8 * figure - * * column 3, lines 20-30 *; | [A]JP2003147593 ; | [A]DE4419016 (ARWEILER ARMIN [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]GB295791 (CANNING & CO LTD W, et al) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 7 - line 100; figure . *; | [A]FR2526448 (CORRAND MARCEL [FR]) [A] 5,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE1621064 (DITTMANN & CO CARL) [A] 8 * figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030903), vol. 2003, no. 09, & JP2003147593 A 20030521 (AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * |