EP1629621 - METHOD AND TESTER FOR DETERMINING THE ERROR RATE OF A MOBILE RADIO DEVICE WITH VARIABLE BLOCK ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLAUMANN, Ralf Kirchenstrasse 2a 85659 Forstern / DE | 02 /
SCHINDLMEIER, Rudolf Am Baderwinkel 13 82205 Gilching / DE | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04723561.9 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004EP03251 | Priority number, date | DE2003125288 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325288 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109969 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629621 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629621 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/24, H04W24/06 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,KR);
H04L1/24 (EP,KR);
H04L1/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | H04L1/24, H04Q7/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TESTER ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER FEHLERRATE EINES MOBILFUNKGERÄTS BEI VARIABLER BLOCKZUORDNUNG | [2009/08] | English: | METHOD AND TESTER FOR DETERMINING THE ERROR RATE OF A MOBILE RADIO DEVICE WITH VARIABLE BLOCK ALLOCATION | [2006/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET TESTEUR POUR DETERMINER UN TAUX D'ERREURS DANS UN APPAREIL DE RADIOTELEPHONIE MOBILE LORS DE L'AFFECTATION VARIABLE DE BLOCS | [2006/09] |
Former [2006/09] | VERFAHREN UND TESTER ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER FEHLERRATE EINES MOBILFUNKGER TS BEI VARIABLER BLOCKZUORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
TR | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | PL | 24.06.2009 | |
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 24.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001052091 (GOLDSACK PETER JAMES SUTHERLAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0023] ** paragraph [0029] *; | [X] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Individual equipment type requirements and interworking; Special conformance testing functions (3GPP TS 44.014 version 4.2.0 Release 4); ETSI TS 144 014", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200207), vol. 3-G2, no. V420, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014010543 [X] 1-14 * Abschnitte 5.1.1, 5.1.2, 5.2.1, 5.2.3.1, 5.4.2.2 * | [A] - GOZALVEZ J ET AL, "On the effect of correlation in multislot link layer analysis for GPRS", IEEE VTS-FALL VTC 2000. 52ND, (20000924), pages 444 - 450, XP010525204 [A] 1-14 * page 445, column L, paragraph L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2000.886692 | Examination | - AJIG WESSAM; GODLEWSKI P., "Effects of circuit switched transmissions over GPRS performance", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD ACM INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF WIRELESS AND MOBILE SYSTEMS, Boston, Massachusetts, United States, (2000), pages 20 - 26, URL: http://doi.acm.org/10.1145/346855.346859 | - CHRISTIAN BETTSTETTER; HANS-JÖRG VÖGEL; JÖRG EBERSPÄCHER, "GSM PHASE 2+ GENERAL PACKET RADIO SERVICE GPRS: ARCHITECTURE, PROTOCOLS, AND AIR INTERFACE", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SURVEYS, (199909), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 2 - 14, XP002254902 | - AJIB W; GODLEWSKI P, "Service disciplines performance for WWW traffic in GPRS system", FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 3G MOBILE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, (20000327), doi:doi:10.1049/cp:20000086, pages 431 - 435, XP001503353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:20000086 | - TS 51.010 V5.3.0 Release 5, Seiten 366-404, 3GPP, (200304), XP007904928 |