EP1667293 - ELECTRICITY SUBSTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Eléctrica de Espana S.A. Paseo del Conde de Los Gaitanes, 177 28109 Alcobendas / ES | [2010/41] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Red Eléctrica de Espana S.A. Paseo del Conde de Los Gaitanes, 177 28109 ALcobendas / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALAMANCA SEGOVIANO, Francisco José Paseo del Conde de los Gaitanes, 177 28109 Alcobendas Madrid / ES | 02 /
MARTINEZ VIDAL, Cristina Paseo del Conde de los Gaitanes, 177 28109 Alcobendas Madrid / ES | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04723628.6 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004ES00137 | Priority number, date | ES20030001322P | 03.06.2003 Original published format: ES 200301322 P | ES20030002517P | 28.10.2003 Original published format: ES 200302517 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004107522 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667293 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667293 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02B5/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H02B5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 02.01.2006 | LT | 02.01.2006 | LV | 02.01.2006 | MK | 02.01.2006 | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE UNTERSTATION | [2006/23] | English: | ELECTRICITY SUBSTATION | [2006/23] | French: | SOUS-STATION ELECTRIQUE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2005 | Translation filed | 02.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | GB | 26.03.2011 | IE | 26.03.2011 | LU | 26.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 26.03.2011 | ||
IE | 26.03.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 26.03.2011 | ||
IE | 26.03.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 26.03.2011 | ||
IE | 26.03.2011 | ||
LU | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
GB | 26.03.2011 | ||
IE | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XP]US2004037025 (ABE KOSUKE [JP]); | [AP]US2004027791 (MARMONIER JEAN [FR], et al); | [A]US5991148 (HEIL FRANZ [CH], et al); | [A]US5589674 (BERGER ERNST [CH], et al) |