Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
05.06.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.01.2009 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
30.01.2009 | Change - classification | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
05.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.10.2007 | Change - representative | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
21.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2006 | Change - designated states | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
02.06.2006 | Change - extension states | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
02.03.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.11.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
11.11.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
07.01.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.12.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.10.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.10.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.07.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication |