EP1610118 - METHOD FOR DERIVING CALCULATION EQUATION FOR CALCULATING COATING FILM IRREGULARITY AND METHOD FOR DIGITIZING COATING FILM IRREGULARITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Ohyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8511 / JP | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONOGAKI, Yoshihiro 2-99, Nozomigaoka, Handa-Shi, Aichi 4750019 / JP | 02 /
ASABA, Takao 1-14-5-104, Chidori, Ota-Ku, Tokyo 1460083 / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04723783.9 | 26.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004JP04334 | Priority number, date | JP20030096128 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003096128 | [2005/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088293 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1610118 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G01J3/50, B05D3/00, G06T7/00, G06T7/40 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/504 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
G06T7/44 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G01J3/465 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30144 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/52] | G01N21/88, G01J3/50, B05D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABLEITEN DER KALKULATIONSGLEICHUNG ZUR KALKULATION DER BESCHICHTUNGSFILMIRREGULARITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM DIGITALISIEREN DER BESCHICHTUNGSFILMIRREGULARITÄT | [2005/52] | English: | METHOD FOR DERIVING CALCULATION EQUATION FOR CALCULATING COATING FILM IRREGULARITY AND METHOD FOR DIGITIZING COATING FILM IRREGULARITY | [2005/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE DERIVATION D'UNE EQUATION DE CALCUL POUR LE CALCUL DE L'IRREGULARITE D'UN FILM DE REVETEMENT ET PROCEDE DE NUMERISATION DE L'IRREGULARITE DU FILM DE REVETEMENT | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2004 | Translation filed | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 07.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ROY R. ROSENBERGER, "Mottle Measurement of Wet Trap, Back Trap and Other Motley Images", VERITY IA LLC, Appleton, WI 54914, USA, (20020912), URL: http://www.verityia.com/pdf/measurement-motley-images.pdf, XP002511484 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - MCCAMY C S, "Observation and measurement of the appearance of metallic materials. II. Micro appearance", COLOR RESEARCH & APPLICATION WILEY USA, (199812), vol. 23, no. 6, ISSN 0361-2317, pages 362 - 373, XP002511485 [A] 1-7 * page 364 * * page 366 - page 371 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6378(199812)23:6<362::AID-COL4>3.0.CO;2-5 | [A] - FAHLCRANTZ C -M ET AL, "The influence of mean reflectance on perceived print mottle", JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY SOC. IMAGING SCI. & TECHNOL USA, (200301), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 1062-3701, pages 54 - 59, XP002511486 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH10318841 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPS613016 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK, et al); | [A]JP2000304696 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) |