EP1609855 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PLANT STORAGE ORGAN WITH HIGH PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT PROTEIN AND NOVEL RECOMBINANT PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGROBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 1-2 Kannondai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 4-1, Ohji 1-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0002 / JP | For all designated states SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO., LTD. 35, Higashi Sotobori-cho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGITA, Koichi, Nippon Paper Industries Co., Ltd. 5-21-1, Oji, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0002 / JP | 02 /
KASAHARA, Saori, Nippon Paper Industries Co., Ltd. 5-21-1, Oji, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0002 / JP | 03 /
EBINUMA, Hiroyasu, Nippon Paper Industries Co. Ltd 5-21-1, Oji, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0002 / JP | 04 /
TAKAIWA, Humio 2-1-2, Kannondai, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | 05 /
JOMORI, Takahito, Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd. 35, Higashisotobori-cho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 06 /
HAYASHI, Yuji, c/o Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35, Higashisotobori-cho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 07 /
TASHITA, Akira, c/o Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co. Ltd 35, Higashisotobori-cho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 08 /
KOBARA, Yukari, c/o Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co. Ltd 35, Higashisotobori-cho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04723838.1 | 26.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004JP04382 | Priority number, date | JP20030092827 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003092827 | [2005/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087910 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609855 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01H5/00, C07K14/605 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/605 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PFLANZLICHEN SPEICHERORGANS MIT HOHER PRODUKTION AN REKOMBINANTEM PROTEIN SOWIE NEUES REKOMBINANTES PROTEIN | [2005/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PLANT STORAGE ORGAN WITH HIGH PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT PROTEIN AND NOVEL RECOMBINANT PROTEIN | [2005/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ORGANE DE STOCKAGE VEGETAL AVEC UNE PRODUCTION ELEVEE DE PROTEINES DE RECOMBINAISON ET NOUVELLE PROTEINE DE RECOMBINAISON | [2005/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2005 | Translation filed | 28.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP10174310.2 / EP2256189 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5545618 (BUCKLEY DOUGLAS I [US], et al) [Y] 19-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0063401 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0155213 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [Y] 19-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0172959 (UNIV AUBURN [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y] - YANG DAICHANG ET AL, "Expression and localization of human lysozyme in the endosperm of transgenic rice", PLANTA, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (200302), vol. 216, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 597 - 603, XP002310362 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - YANG DAICHANG ET AL, "Expression of the REB transcriptional activator in rice grains improves the yield of recombinant proteins whose genes are controlled by a Reb-responsive promoter", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010925), vol. 98, no. 20, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11438 - 11443, XP002195307 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.201411298 | [Y] - HOSOYAMA HIROSHI ET AL, "Introduction of a chimeric gene encoding an oryzacystatin-beta-glucuronidase fusion protein into rice protoplasts and regeneration of transformed plants", PLANT CELL REPORTS, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (199512), vol. 15, no. 3-4, ISSN 0721-7714, pages 174 - 177, XP008083836 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - MASAAKI TERASHIMA, NAOHIRO HASHIKAWA, MASAYASU HATTORI, HIROYUKI YOSHIDA, "Growth characteristics of rice cell genetically modified for recombinant human [alpha]1-antitrypsin production", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (200211), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 155 - 160, XP002477253 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-703X(02)00064-5 | [Y] - VAIN P ET AL, "Expression of an engineered cysteine proteinase inhibitor (Oryzacystatin-IDELTAD86) for nematode resistance in transgenic rice plants", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (199802), vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 266 - 271, XP002477254 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001220050735 | [Y] - GIRI C.C. ET AL., "Production of transgenic rice with agronomically useful genes: an assessment", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (20001201), vol. 18, no. 8, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 653 - 683, XP004317590 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0734-9750(00)00053-7 | [Y] - ROECKEL P ET AL, "EFFECTS OF SEED-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF A CYTOKININ BIOSYNTHETIC GENE ON CANOLA AND TOBACCO PHENOTYPES", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, LONDON, GB, (199703), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 0962-8819, pages 133 - 141, XP000938801 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018425720949 | [T] - YASUDA HIROSHI ET AL, "Expression of the small peptide GLP-1 in transgenic plants", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, LONDON, GB, (200510), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0962-8819, pages 677 - 684, XP002451372 [T] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11248-005-6631-4 | International search | [A]WO0155213 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [A]JPH05506427 | [AP] - XUE G.P. ET AL., "Selectable marker-free transgenic barley producing a high level of cellulase (1,4-beta-glucanase) in developing grains", PLANT CELL REP, (200307), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 1088 - 1094, XP002980074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00299-003-0627-4 | [Y] - PATEL M. ET AL., "Transgenic barley expressing a fungal xylanase gene in the endosperm of the deveoping grains", MOLECULAR BREEDING, (2000), vol. 6, pages 113 - 123, XP002980075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009640427515 | [Y] - SOJIKUL P. ET AL., "A plant signal peptide-hepatitis B surface antigen fusion protein with enhanced stability and immunogenicity expressed in plant cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (20030304), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 2209 - 2214, XP002980076 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0438037100 | [Y] - YANG D. ET AL., "Expression of the REB transcriptional activator in rice grains improves the yield of recombinant proteins whose genes are controlled by a Reb-responsive promoter", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (20010925), vol. 98, no. 20, pages 11438 - 11443, XP002195307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.201411298 | [Y] - HORVATH H. ET AL., "The production of recombinant proteins in transgenic barley grains", PROC NATL ACAD OF SCI, (20000215), vol. 97, no. 4, pages 1914 - 1919, XP002173225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.030527497 | [Y] - EBINUMA H. ET AL., "Selection of marker-free transgenic plants using the isopentenyl transferase gene", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (199703), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 2117 - 2121, XP002102275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.6.2117 | [Y] - KOICHI SUGITA ET AL, "Keitai Henka de Marker Free Kumikae Shokubutsu o Senbatsu", BIOSCIENCE & INDUSTRY, (1997), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 210 - 212, XP002981590 | by applicant | - KNUDSEN; PRIDAL, EUR. J. PHARM., (1996), vol. 318, pages 429 - 435 | - ADELHORST ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 6275 |